EP0095731 - Water-insoluble monoazo dyestuffs, their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELLA Aktiengesellschaft Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | [1983/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bühler, Ulrich, Dr. Kastanienweg 8 D-8755 Alzenau / DE | 02 /
Tappe, Horst, Dr. Ringstrasse 9 D-6057 Dietzenbach / DE | 03 /
Bode, Albert Finkenweg 1 D-6231 Schwalbach / DE | 04 /
Hähnke, Manfred, Dr. Behringer Strasse 13 D-6233 Kelkheim / DE | 05 /
Roth, Kurt Breckenheimer Strasse 35 D-6238 Hofheim / DE | [1983/49] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg, et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/49] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr., et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105200.6 | 26.05.1983 | [1983/49] | Priority number, date | DE19823220563 | 01.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3220563 | [1983/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0095731 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C09B29/10, // C09B29/01, D06P1/18 | [1983/49] | CPC: |
C09B29/0003 (EP);
C09B29/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/49] | Title | German: | Wasserunlösliche Monoazofarbstoffe, ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1983/49] | English: | Water-insoluble monoazo dyestuffs, their preparation and their use | [1983/49] | French: | Colorants monoazoiques insolubles dans l'eau, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1983/49] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/29] | 14.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/26] | 21.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1127885 ; | [YD]DE1089094 ; | [Y]CA1096557 ; | [A]US2217693 ; | [A]FR853177 ; | [A]US2200005 |