EP0096810 - Coated superalloy gas turbine components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.12.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1983/52] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luthra, Krishan Lal 2150 Rosa Road, Apt. C7C Schenectady, New York 12509 / US | [1983/52] | Representative(s) | Sieb, Rolf, et al Finstertal 12 69514 Laudenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr., et al Finstertal 12 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
Former [1985/36] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr. General Electric - Deutschland Patentabteilung Praunheimer Landstrasse 50 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [1983/52] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr. European Patent Attorney Kaiserstrasse 41 D-6000 Frankfurt (Main) 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105489.5 | 03.06.1983 | [1983/52] | Priority number, date | US19820387725 | 11.06.1982 Original published format: US 387725 | US19830479618 | 28.03.1983 Original published format: US 479618 | [1983/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0096810 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0096810 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096810 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0096810 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/28, C23F17/00 | [1983/52] | CPC: |
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12931 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12937 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12979 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/52] | Title | German: | Beschichtete Gasturbinenteile aus Superlegierung | [1983/52] | English: | Coated superalloy gas turbine components | [1983/52] | French: | Pièce en superalliage pourvue d'un revêtement pour des turbines à gaz | [1983/52] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 27.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.09.1989
09.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.09.1989
09.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 25.10.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.04.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.01.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.05.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.05.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.10.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2758618 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]FR2463191 (HOWMET TURBINE COMPONENTS [US]); | [A]FR2467243 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]US3053689 (SHOUDY JR ALBERT A, et al); | [A]EP0025263 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]); | [A]US3642519 (TINER NATHAN A, et al); | [A]DE2402827 (COCKERILL); | [A]DE1621290 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [A]EP0031580 (EBARA CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2226483 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |