EP0096830 - Safety system for robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/52] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchihashi, Akira 5-34-11, Heiwadai Nagareyama-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1983/52] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/52] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105586.8 | 07.06.1983 | [1983/52] | Priority number, date | JP19820096257 | 07.06.1982 Original published format: JP 9625782 | [1983/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0096830 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0096830 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096830 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00, B25J13/00 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
B25J19/06 (EP,US);
B25J19/023 (EP,US);
G05B19/4061 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49157 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/19] | B25J13/00, B25J13/00 | ||
Former IPC [1983/52] | B25J13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1983/52] | Title | German: | Sicherheitssystem für Roboter | [1983/52] | English: | Safety system for robot | [1983/52] | French: | Système de sécurité pour robots | [1983/52] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/52] | 14.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4187051 [ ] (KIRSCH JERRY [US], et al); | US4146924 [ ] (BIRK JOHN R, et al); | GB1586017 [ ] (SEPA); | US4236794 [ ] (GORDON GARY B); | US4316657 [ ] (SUZUKI TAKEOMI, et al); | US4136957 [ ] (UNO TAKESHI, et al) |