EP0111623 - Apparatus for burner position adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC. 1000 Prospect Hill Road Box 500 Windsor Connecticut 06095-0500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | For all designated states COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC. 1000 Prospect Hill Road Box 500 Windsor Connecticut 06095-0500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chadshay, Roman 704, Windsor Avenue Windsor Connecticut / US | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Gross, Gernot K. (DE) Kleiberweg 5 D-65207 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | Gross, Gernot K. Kleiberweg 5 D-65207 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105853.2 | 15.06.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | US19820393288 | 01.07.1982 Original published format: US 393288 | [1984/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0111623 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0111623 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F23C5/06, F23D23/00, F22G5/02 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
F23D23/00 (EP,US);
F23C7/00 (KR);
F23C5/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/26] | F23C5/06, F23D23/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Einstellung der Brennerlage | [1984/26] | English: | Apparatus for burner position adjustment | [1984/26] | French: | Dispositif pour régler la position du brûleur | [1984/26] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 04.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/21] | 02.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/05] | Request for further processing for: | 07.01.1984 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.1984 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.1984 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4304196 (CHADSHAY ROMAN, et al); | [Y]GB686130 (WALTHER & CIE AG); | [A]US3284008 (MILLER EARLE C); | [A]US1612007 (FURLONG MARTIN J); | [A]US3062196 (PAUL PROFOS); | [A]GB462001 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO) |