EP0101822 - Fuel injector for an internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Katsuoki, Dipl.-Ing. Eltingerstrasse 13 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Komaroff, Iwan Schwabelweiser Weg 13a D-8400 Regensburg / DE | [1984/10] | Application number, filing date | 83106278.1 | 28.06.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | DE19823229190 | 05.08.1982 Original published format: DE 3229190 | [1984/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101822 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101822 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/06, F02M61/16, F02M61/18 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
F02M61/16 (EP);
F02M61/06 (EP);
F02M61/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/10] | Title | German: | Kraftstoff-Einspritzdüse für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1984/10] | English: | Fuel injector for an internal-combustion engine | [1984/10] | French: | Buse d'injection de carburant pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1984/10] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1983 | Examination requested [1984/10] | 29.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1843821 (LEO JOSLYN PAUL); | [A]FR2147631 (KRAUS WERNER); | [A]FR2344723 (INST MOTORENBAU PROF HUBER [DE]); | [A]CH356636 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) | Examination | EP0020888 | EP0007724 | GB1330181 |