EP0097971 - Method for producing low hydrogen content in steels produced by subsurface pneumatic refining [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.04.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andreini, Rockne James 18204 Northeast 127th Street Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [1987/21] |
Former [1984/05] | 01 /
Andreini, Rockne James 18204 Northeast 127th Street Bellevue Washington 98004 / US | ||
Former [1984/02] | 01 /
Andreini, Rockne James 10635 N.E. 29th Street, Apt.118 Bellevue Washington 98004 / US | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Schwan, Ivo, et al Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/02] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106349.0 | 29.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | US19820393467 | 29.06.1982 Original published format: US 393467 | [1984/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0097971 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0097971 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097971 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/34, C21C7/068, C21C5/00 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
C21C5/005 (EP,US);
C21C5/34 (EP,US);
C21C7/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einstellen von niedrigen Wasserstoffgehalt bei nach dem Durchblasverfahren hergestellten Stählen | [1984/02] | English: | Method for producing low hydrogen content in steels produced by subsurface pneumatic refining | [1984/02] | French: | Procédé permettant l'obtention de teneurs basses en hydrogène dans des acides produits par affinage pneumatique submergé | [1984/02] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 22.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.1988
INADMISSIBLE AGA Aktiebolag S-181 81 Lidingö / SE Opponent's representative Wiedemann, Bernd W AGA AKTIEBOLAG Patent Department 181 81 Lidingö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.1988
INADMISSIBLE AGA Aktiebolag S-181 81 Lidingö / SE Opponent's representative Wiedemann, Bernd AGA AKTIEBOLAG Patent Department S-181 81 Lidingö / SE | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.05.1987 | AT | 29.06.1989 | GB | 29.06.1994 | BE | 30.06.1994 | CH | 30.06.1994 | LI | 30.06.1994 | SE | 30.06.1994 | FR | 28.02.1995 | DE | 01.03.1995 | [1995/41] |
Former [1995/37] | NL | 20.05.1987 | |
AT | 29.06.1989 | ||
GB | 29.06.1994 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
SE | 30.06.1994 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/31] | NL | 20.05.1987 | |
AT | 29.06.1989 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.06.1994 | ||
LI | 30.06.1994 | ||
SE | 30.06.1994 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | NL | 20.05.1987 | |
AT | 29.06.1989 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
SE | 30.06.1994 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | NL | 20.05.1987 | |
AT | 29.06.1989 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
SE | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/27] | NL | 20.05.1987 | |
AT | 29.06.1989 | ||
BE | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1990/42] | NL | 20.05.1987 | |
AT | 29.06.1989 | ||
Former [1988/52] | NL | 20.05.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2548849 (TAYLOR CHARLES R, et al); | [A]US3046107 (NELSON EDWARD C, et al); | [A]DE1909780 (MAXIMILIANSHUETTE EISENWERK); | [A]LU66234 ; | [A]EP0008463 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [AD]US4278464 (BURY ROLAND P, et al) | [A] - METALS ABSTRACTS, vol. 11, July 1978, pages 1234-1235, abstract no. 450272 | [A] - STAHL UND EISEN, vol. 89, no. 13, 26th June 1969, pages 710-716, Düsseldorf, DE. | Examination | EP0087328 |