EP0098528 - Refuse receptacle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.08.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1991 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bitsch, Bartholomäus Eckweg 15 D-64678 Lindenfels / DE | [1984/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Missling, Arne, et al Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 D-35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Missling, Arne, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 D-35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106367.2 | 30.06.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | DE19823224950 | 03.07.1982 Original published format: DE 3224950 | [1984/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0098528 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0098528 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098528 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0098528 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/02, B65F1/14 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
B65F1/02 (EP);
B65F1/122 (EP);
B65F2220/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/03] | Title | German: | Müllbehälter | [1984/03] | English: | Refuse receptacle | [1984/03] | French: | Récipient à ordures | [1984/03] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 08.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.1987
11.08.1987
ADMISSIBLE van Cosburgh, Pieter (NL) / Häfner, Walter (DE) Teugelaan 3A / Kentruper Str. 7 NL-1871 AJ Schoorl / D-4817 Leopoldshöhe / NL Opponent's representative Stracke, Alexander Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.1987
11.08.1987
ADMISSIBLE van Cosburgh, Pieter (NL) / Häfner, Walter (DE) Teugelaan 3A / Kentruper Str. 7 NL-1871 AJ Schoorl / D-4817 Leopoldshöhe / NL Opponent's representative Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | 13.08.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.12.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 01.09.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 16.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.12.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.06.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2648209 (SCHNEIDER STAEDTEREINIGUNG); | [AD]FR2159341 (STREUBER SULO EISENWERK F) |