EP0098546 - Novel aromatic musks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1986 [1986/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRITZSCHE DODGE & OLCOTT INC. 76 Ninth Avenue New York, NY 10011 / US | [1984/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willis, Brian J. 5 Goose Cove Lane Ramsey New Jersey 07466 / US | 02 /
Zazula, Teodosij J. 64-41 84th Street Rego Park New York 11374 / US | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106438.1 | 01.07.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | US19820394847 | 02.07.1982 Original published format: US 394847 | US19830494674 | 13.05.1983 Original published format: US 494674 | [1984/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098546 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098546 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C47/57, C07C47/575, C07C45/45, A61K7/46 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
C11B9/0053 (EP,US);
C07C37/18 (EP,US);
C07C41/16 (EP,US);
C07C45/27 (EP,US);
C07C45/565 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C37/18, C07C39/17 (EP,US);
C07C41/16, C07C43/21 (EP,US);
C07C45/27, C07C47/575 (EP,US);
C07C45/565, C07C47/57 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/03] | Title | German: | Aromatische Moschusverbindungen | [1984/03] | English: | Novel aromatic musks | [1984/03] | French: | Composés musqués aromatiques | [1984/03] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 22.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB760667 [ ] (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA); | GB786397 [ ] (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA) |