EP0114920 - Integrated circuit resistor structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1987 [1987/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Kwang Kon 18 Vail Road Poughkeepsie New York 12603 / US | [1984/32] | Representative(s) | Schröder, Otto Heinrich Albrecht, et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Schröder, Otto H., Dr. Ing., et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1984/32] | Schröder, Otto H., Dr. Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 83106489.4 | 04.07.1983 | [1984/32] | Priority number, date | US19820454911 | 30.12.1982 Original published format: US 454911 | [1984/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0114920 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114920 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/02, H01L39/24 | [1984/32] | CPC: |
H10N69/00 (EP,US);
H10N60/0156 (EP,US);
Y10S505/813 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12528 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12806 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12819 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12889 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/32] | Title | German: | Widerstandsstruktur für integrierte Schaltung | [1984/32] | English: | Integrated circuit resistor structure | [1984/32] | French: | Structure de résistance pour circuit intégré | [1984/32] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 20.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3877063 (ABRAHAM HOWARD E, et al); | [A]CH587567 (IBM); | [A]GB1492580 (IBM) |