EP0102475 - Lever arrangement, in particular for an agricultural tractor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1988 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lane, Lloyd Lowell 159 Valley Road Waterloo Iowa 50701 / US | 02 /
Hosford, Gregory Sander 313 Drynan Dr. Waterloo Iowa 50701 / US | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | [1984/11] | Application number, filing date | 83106534.7 | 05.07.1983 | [1984/11] | Priority number, date | US19820397636 | 12.07.1982 Original published format: US 397636 | [1984/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102475 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102475 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102475 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/04, G05G5/06 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
G05G1/04 (EP,US);
G05G5/005 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7021 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20085 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20642 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/11] | Title | German: | Hebelanordnung, insbesondere für Ackerschlepper | [1984/11] | English: | Lever arrangement, in particular for an agricultural tractor | [1984/11] | French: | Agencement de levier, en particulier pour tracteur agricole | [1984/11] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 12.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.11.1987 | FR | 04.11.1987 | AT | 05.07.1988 | SE | 06.07.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1990/09] | BE | 04.11.1987 | |
AT | 05.07.1988 | ||
SE | 06.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | BE | 04.11.1987 | |
SE | 06.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 04.11.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1370101 [ ] (BENNES MARREL); | US3985039 [ ] (FEDERSPIEL JOSEPH A); | EP0071674 [ ] (DEERE & CO [US]) |