EP0100878 - Device for the manual insertion of a transparency in a transparency frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEIMUPLAST PETER MUNDT GmbH & Co. KG Partenkirchner Strasse 50 82490 Farchant / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | For all designated states GEIMUPLAST PETER MUNDT GmbH & Co. KG Partenkirchner Strasse 50 D-82490 Farchant / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stemmer, Gottfried Münchner Strasse 39 D-8100 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Pohl, Claus, Dipl.-Ing. Haidestrasse 1 D-8116 Eschenlohe / DE | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Eduard, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | Lorenz, Eduard Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, et al Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106658.4 | 07.07.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | DE19820019474U | 07.07.1982 Original published format: DE 8219474 U | DE19833317960 | 17.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3317960 | [1984/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0100878 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0100878 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0100878 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G03D15/10 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
G03D15/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53909 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53961 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum manuellen Einführen eines Diapositivs in einen Diapositiv-Rahmen | [1984/08] | English: | Device for the manual insertion of a transparency in a transparency frame | [1984/08] | French: | Dispositif pour l'introduction manuelle d'un dia dans un cadre à dias | [1984/08] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 14.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.05.1988 | NL | 11.05.1988 | SE | 31.05.1988 | AT | 07.07.1988 | CH | 31.07.1988 | LI | 31.07.1988 | [1990/09] |
Former [1990/02] | BE | 11.05.1988 | |
NL | 11.05.1988 | ||
SE | 31.05.1988 | ||
CH | 31.07.1988 | ||
LI | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/23] | BE | 11.05.1988 | |
NL | 11.05.1988 | ||
SE | 31.05.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | BE | 11.05.1988 | |
NL | 11.05.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 11.05.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1295877 (GEIMUPLAST MUNDT KG PETER); | [A]FR1018281 (KODAK PATHE) |