EP0100006 - Ratchet wrench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitschmann, Fred-Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Arabellastrasse 5 D-8000 München 81 / DE | [1984/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/06] | Application number, filing date | 83106672.5 | 07.07.1983 | [1984/06] | Priority number, date | DE19823225815 | 09.07.1982 Original published format: DE 3225815 | DE19833313151 | 12.04.1983 Original published format: DE 3313151 | [1984/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0100006 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0100006 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B25B13/46 | [1984/06] | CPC: |
B25B13/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/06] | Title | German: | Ratschenartiger Maulschlüssel | [1984/06] | English: | Ratchet wrench | [1984/06] | French: | Clé à cliquet | [1984/06] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/39] | 07.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.1985 | 31.07.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.12.1986 | IT | 30.12.1986 | NL | 30.12.1986 | SE | 31.12.1986 | AT | 07.07.1987 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 30.12.1986 | |
IT | 30.12.1986 | ||
NL | 30.12.1986 | ||
SE | 31.12.1986 | ||
AT | 07.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/16] | BE | 30.12.1986 | |
NL | 30.12.1986 | ||
SE | 31.12.1986 | ||
AT | 07.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/13] | BE | 30.12.1986 | |
NL | 30.12.1986 | ||
AT | 07.07.1987 | ||
Former [1988/43] | BE | 30.12.1986 | |
NL | 30.12.1986 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 30.12.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE449510 (JOHANN EMIL KLINGLER); | [A]CH365348 (KYBURZ KARL [CH]); | [A]US2914979 (WEINSTEIN ABRAHAM S); | [A]FR2134871 (FILLEUL ANDRE) |