EP0103101 - Device for reducing the bending vibrations of a printing cylinder caused by rolling over the groove [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1984/12] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köbler, Ingo Zeisigweg 7 D-8901 Anhausen / DE | 02 /
Stöckl, Herbert Erlkönigweg 35 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Meinke, Peter, Dr. Meisenweg 6 D.8031 Steinbach / DE | 04 /
Engl, Albert Haus Nr. 12 D-8151 Reitham / DE | 05 /
Hechler, Hatto, Dr. Zieglerstrasse 7 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1984/12] | Application number, filing date | 83106856.4 | 13.07.1983 | [1984/12] | Priority number, date | DE19823230118 | 13.08.1982 Original published format: DE 3230118 | [1984/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0103101 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0103101 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103101 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/08 | [1984/12] | CPC: |
B41F13/085 (EP,US);
F16F15/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1984/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Reduzierung der durch die Kanalüberrollung in einem Druckwerkzylinder angeregten Biegeschwingungen | [1984/12] | English: | Device for reducing the bending vibrations of a printing cylinder caused by rolling over the groove | [1984/12] | French: | Dispositif pour la réduction de vibrations de flexion d'un cylindre de machine d'impression, provoquées par le roulement sur les gorges | [1984/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 07.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4125073 (BAIN LAWRENCE J); | [A]GB2073368 (WILL E C H GMBH & CO); | [A]DE3012060 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]); | [A]US3521340 (GALLANT JAMES O, et al) |