EP0101936 - Boride-dispersed alloy material and process for manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 1, Aza Noda Oaza Toyota Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi-ken 480-0195 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO 41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 1, Aza Noda Oaza Toyota Oguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Hironori 24-9, Minamigaoka 1-chome Nisshin-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Mizuno, Jiro 56-310, Aza Ishigane Oaza Iwasaki Nisshin-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Arai, Tohru 9-3, Yashiro Misaki-cho Toyoake-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Kasuya, Osami 10-12, Aza Harayama Tosaki-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Ono, Koichi 942, Matamaru Gifu-shi Gifu-ken / JP | 06 /
Ando, Hisahiro 50, Aikawa-cho Kuwana-shi Mie-ken / JP | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107389.5 | 27.07.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | JP19820131457 | 28.07.1982 Original published format: JP 13145782 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0101936 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0101936 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101936 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/00, C23C8/68, C22C32/00 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
C23C12/00 (EP);
C23C8/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/10] | C23C9/00, C23C11/00, C22C32/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1984/10] | Title | German: | Legierungsmaterial mit dispergierten Boriden und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1984/10] | English: | Boride-dispersed alloy material and process for manufacturing same | [1984/10] | French: | Matériau d'alliage contenant une dispersion de borure et procédé pour la fabrication dudit matériau | [1984/10] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 07.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1990277 ; | [X]US2001017 ; | [A]FR1231094 ; | [A]DE1210565 ; | [E]DE3307182 |