EP0101018 - Impact printer head capable of printing a dot at a distance narrower than a thickness of a printer unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1987 [1987/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukui, Izumu c/o NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hamatsuki, Takeshige c/o NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yano, Takeshi c/o NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sato, Eiichi c/o NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Inui, Osamu c/o NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107667.4 | 03.08.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | JP19820136723 | 05.08.1982 Original published format: JP 13672382 | JP19830103809 | 10.06.1983 Original published format: JP 10380983 | JP19830108685 | 17.06.1983 Original published format: JP 10868583 | JP19830139038 | 29.07.1983 Original published format: JP 13903883 | JP19830139039 | 29.07.1983 Original published format: JP 13903983 | [1984/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101018 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101018 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/10 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
B41J2/295 (EP,US);
B41J2/505 (KR);
B41J2/5056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/08] | Title | German: | Schlagdruckkopf, welcher imstande ist, Punkte in einem Abstand voneinander zu drucken, der kleiner ist als die Dicke eines Druckelements | [1984/08] | English: | Impact printer head capable of printing a dot at a distance narrower than a thickness of a printer unit | [1984/08] | French: | Tête d'impression à impact pouvant imprimer des points à une distance inférieure à la largeur d'un élément d'imprimante | [1984/08] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 07.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4341478 (BERNARDIS FRANCESCO, et al); | [X]DE2834628 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]DE2716618 (TRIUMPH WERKE NUERNBERG AG); | [A]GB2035905 (SINOTO N); | [AP]EP0065784 (NEC CORP [JP]) | Examination | EP0027560 |