EP0113802 - Indexable machine tool turret and attachments therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARDINGE BROTHERS INC. 1420 College Avenue Elmira New York 14902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states HARDINGE BROTHERS INC. 1420 College Avenue Elmira New York 14902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waldron, Joseph P. 216 Sunnyfield Drive Horseheads New York 14845 / US | 02 /
Brown, Ivan R. P.O. Box 390 Breesport New York 14816 / US | [1984/30] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | Boggio, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 83107794.6 | 08.08.1983 | [1984/30] | Priority number, date | US19830458612 | 17.01.1983 Original published format: US 458612 | [1984/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0113802 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0113802 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/32, B23Q17/02 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
B23Q16/102 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0042 (EP,US);
B23Q11/10 (EP,US);
B23Q2220/002 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5165 (EP,US);
Y10T74/14 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1453 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1494 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1985/39] | B23B29/32, B23Q17/02 | ||
Former IPC [1984/30] | B23Q17/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1984/30] | Title | German: | Schaltbarer Revolverkopf für Werkzeugmaschinen und Zusatzeinrichtungen dafür | [1984/30] | English: | Indexable machine tool turret and attachments therefore | [1984/30] | French: | Tourelle revolver indexable pour machine-outils et dispositifs additionnels pour celle-ci | [1984/30] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 11.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 11.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/09] | 16.10.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1988 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3999264 (CARMEN BRUCE WAYNE); | [A]US3798721 (SCHALLES E) |