EP0111051 - Actuator apparatus integrating a position monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/25] | Compact real time controller with improved magnetic characteristics | ||
[1990/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersen, Christian C. 206 Conant Road Westwood Massachusetts / US | 02 /
Westgate, Bernard C., Jr. 85 Farrwood Drive Bradford Massachusetts / US | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Haibach, Tino, et al Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp Postfach 12 11 20 80035 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Haibach, Tino, Dr. Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp, et al P.O. Box 121120 D-8000 München 12 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108011.4 | 12.08.1983 | [1984/25] | Priority number, date | US19820433468 | 12.10.1982 Original published format: US 433468 | [1984/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0111051 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0111051 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111051 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/20 | [1984/25] | CPC: |
G01D5/2006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/25] | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung mit einem Stellungsüberwachungssystem | [1990/17] | English: | Actuator apparatus integrating a position monitoring system | [1990/17] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement équipé d'un système de contrôle de position | [1990/17] |
Former [1984/25] | Echtzeitkontrolleur mit magnetischen Eigenschaften | ||
Former [1984/25] | Compact real time controller with improved magnetic characteristics | ||
Former [1984/25] | Contrôleur en temps réels avec caractéristiques magnétiques | Examination procedure | 20.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1537362 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]US3786333 (SOMMERIA M) |