EP0105150 - Guide for the support of an electronic module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONTRAVES AG Schaffhauserstrasse 580 8052 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | For all designated states CONTRAVES AG Schaffhauserstrasse 580 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hänseler, Urs Rütistrasse 10 CH-8122 Pfaffhausen / CH | 02 /
Meier, Urs Hubring 44 CH-8303 Bassersdorf / CH | 03 /
Muther, Franz Nordstrasse 408 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | [1984/15] | Application number, filing date | 83108099.9 | 17.08.1983 | [1984/15] | Priority number, date | CH19820005778 | 30.09.1982 Original published format: CH 577882 | [1984/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0105150 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105150 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [1984/15] | CPC: |
H05K7/1418 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45581 (EP,US);
Y10T403/606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/15] | Title | German: | Führungsschiene für elektronische Baugruppenträger | [1984/15] | English: | Guide for the support of an electronic module | [1984/15] | French: | Glissière pour support de modules électroniques | [1984/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/50] | 20.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.12.1986 | AT | 17.08.1987 | [1989/13] |
Former [1988/04] | BE | 03.12.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1271793 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]FR1578065 ; | [A]FR2225916 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) |