EP0101616 - Magnetic head shifting means for flexible disk memory system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Tadashi c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Computer Works 325, Kamimachiya Kamakura-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Yoshiharu c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Computer Works 325, Kamimachiya Kamakura-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Iwamoto, Akira c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Computer Works 325, Kamimachiya Kamakura-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Tedaka, Yoshihisa c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Computer Works 325, Kamimachiya Kamakura-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1984/09] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/09] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108189.8 | 19.08.1983 | [1984/09] | Priority number, date | JP19820145701 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14570182 | [1984/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0101616 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0101616 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101616 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/54, // G11B5/58 | [1984/09] | CPC: |
G11B5/58 (EP,US);
G11B5/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/09] | Title | German: | Magnetkopf-Verschiebungsmittel für ein Speichersystem mit biegsamer Platte | [1984/09] | English: | Magnetic head shifting means for flexible disk memory system | [1984/09] | French: | Moyen de déplacement de tête magnétique pour un système de mémoire à disque flexible | [1984/09] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 27.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP57088570 ; | [AP]JP57147160 ; | [A]FR2108475 (RCA CORP); | [A]FR2299696 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4166284 (DANIELS KENNETH M [US]); | [A]DE2948147 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]GB2060979 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP); | [A]EP0044151 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT], et al); | [A]GB2081959 (SONY CORP); | [A]EP0049943 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 17, no. 1, June 1974, pages 219-220, Armonk, N.Y., US. E. H. EMPSON et al.: "Single spring bidirectional crash stop for use at central axis of linear voice coil motor" | [A] - RADIO ELEKTRONIK SCHAU, vol. 52, no. 2, 1976, pages 18-21, Technische Verlag Erb GesmbH, Vienna, ATAT. W. MEISTER: "The floppy disk-data store for the future" | [AP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 171 (P-140)[1049], 4th September 1982 & JP-A-57 088 570 (RICOH K.K.) 02-06-1982, & JP57088570 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 252 (P-161)[1130], 10th December 1982 & JP-A-57 147 160 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 10-09-1982, & JP57147160 A 00000000 |