EP0103767 - Method of producing a semiconductor device by ion-implantation and device produced by the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1990 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72 Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1984/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ajima, Takashi 2-9-28, Oomachi Kamakura-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | 02 /
Ohshima, Jiro 7-501, 2-8-1, Teraodai Tama-Ku Kawasaki-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | 03 /
Koshino, Yutaka 3-10-6, Uragaoka Yokosuka-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [1984/13] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/13] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108255.7 | 22.08.1983 | [1984/13] | Priority number, date | JP19820145980 | 23.08.1982 Original published format: JP 14598082 | [1984/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0103767 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0103767 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103767 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/265, H01L21/316 | [1984/13] | CPC: |
H01L21/02178 (EP,US);
H01L21/02263 (EP,US);
H01L21/22 (EP,US);
H01L21/26506 (EP,US);
H01L21/2652 (EP,US);
H01L21/3162 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleiteranordnung mittels einer Ionenimplantation und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Anordnung | [1984/13] | English: | Method of producing a semiconductor device by ion-implantation and device produced by the method | [1984/13] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un dispositif semi-conducteur utilisant une étape d'implantation ionique et dispositif produit par ce procédé | [1984/13] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1983 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 26.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3925106 (KU SAN-MEI, et al); | [A]FR2309039 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US4295898 (YOSHIDA MASAKATSU, et al); | [A]DE2045304 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US3773566 (TSUCHIMOTO T); | [A]FR2016207 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]DE2752439 (IBM) |