EP0114184 - Valve control for internal-combustion engines with outwardly opening piston valves to achieve an optimum combustion space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IRM ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GmbH Liebigstrasse 39 D-74211 Leingarten / DE | [1984/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reitz, Johannes Wormser Strasse 31 D-7100 Heilbronn-Kirchhausen / DE | [1984/31] | Application number, filing date | 83108279.7 | 23.08.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | DE19833301007 | 14.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3301007 | [1984/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114184 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114184 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F01L3/20, F01L1/12, F01L1/30 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
F01L5/04 (EP);
F01L1/30 (EP);
F01L3/20 (EP);
F02B1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Gaswechselsteuerung für Brennkraftmaschinen mit nach aussen öffnenden Kolbenventilen zur Erlangung eines optimalen Brennraumes | [1984/31] | English: | Valve control for internal-combustion engines with outwardly opening piston valves to achieve an optimum combustion space | [1984/31] | French: | Commande des soupapes pour des moteurs à combustion interne avec des soupapes à piston qui s'ouvrent à l'extérieur afin d'arriver à une chambre de combustion optimale | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 02.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 09.07.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/15] | 13.08.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | BE706260 [ ]; | DE898380 [ ]; | FR2518166 [ ]; | FR2313555 [ ]; | FR41200E [ ]; | DE3123527 [ ]; | GB314550 [ ] |