EP0105172 - Apparatus for coating optical transmission glass fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/15] | Method for coating optical transmission glass fibers | ||
[1989/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanishi, Toru c/o Yokohama Works Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Tsuneishi, Katsuyuki c/o Yokohama Works Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Masaaki c/o Yokohama Works Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1984/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108299.5 | 23.08.1983 | [1984/15] | Priority number, date | JP19820154335 | 03.09.1982 Original published format: JP 15433582 | JP19820223896 | 22.12.1982 Original published format: JP 22389682 | [1984/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0105172 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0105172 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105172 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/02 | [1984/15] | CPC: |
C03C25/106 (EP,US);
C03C25/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Beschichtung von Glaslichtwellenleitern | [1989/46] | English: | Apparatus for coating optical transmission glass fibers | [1989/46] | French: | Dispositif pour le revêtement de fibres de transmission optique en verre | [1989/46] |
Former [1984/15] | Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Glaslichtwellenleitern | ||
Former [1984/15] | Method for coating optical transmission glass fibers | ||
Former [1984/15] | Procédé de revêtement de fibres de transmission optique en verre | Examination procedure | 05.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 27.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2954582 [ ] (CASE JAMES W); | FR2095873 [ ] (THERMOSPRAY AG); | DE1471913 [ ] (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD); | EP0081166 [ ] (SCHAEFER GMBH FRITZ [DE]); | FR915698 [ ]; | FR951284 [ ] (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP) | [ ] - NAVY TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN Vol. 5, no. 12, December 1980, pages 7-12 Arlington, Virginia, US S.C. RASHLEIGH: "Fabrication of circularly birefringent single mode fibers" * The whole article * |