EP0104436 - Top film for skin packings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states Schumacher, Rudolf Andreasstrasse 35 D-4060 Viersen 12 / DE | ||
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states Helio Folien GmbH Gladbacher Strasse 189 D-41747 Viersen / DE | ||
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft Fritz-Vomfelde-Platz 4 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumacher, Rudolf Andreasstrasse 35 D-4060 Viersen 12 / DE | [1988/13] |
Former [1987/37] | 01 /
* * * | ||
Former [1984/14] | 01 /
Schumacher, Rudolf Andreasstrasse 35 D-4060 Viersen 12 / DE | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1986/34] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1984/14] | Uhlmann, Hans, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. Hofstrasse 83 D-41747 Viersen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108327.4 | 24.08.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | DE19823232209 | 30.08.1982 Original published format: DE 3232209 | [1984/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0104436 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0104436 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104436 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/34, B65D65/40 | [1984/14] | CPC: |
B29C49/22 (EP);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/322 (EP);
B32B2323/046 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/14] | Title | German: | Oberfolie für Skinpackungen | [1984/14] | English: | Top film for skin packings | [1984/14] | French: | Film supérieur pour emballage sous peau | [1984/14] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/41] | 25.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2219003 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]FR2377948 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0008891 (ALLIED CHEM [US]); | [XP]EP0065278 (FELDMUEHLE AG [DE]) |