EP0121590 - Disk drive alignment analyzer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERBATIM CORPORATION 323 Soquel Way Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states VERBATIM CORPORATION 323 Soquel Way Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bond, Charles R. 502 Sark Court Milpitas, Cal. 95035 / US | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Bernhardt, Klaus, et al Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12 D-81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | Bernhardt, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/37] | Bernhardt, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/42] | Reinländer & Bernhardt Patentanwälte Orthstrasse 12 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83108525.3 | 30.08.1983 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | US19830482906 | 07.04.1983 Original published format: US 482906 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121590 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121590 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/58, G11B5/56, G11B19/28, // G11B5/016, G11B27/36 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B5/5543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Spurfolge-Analyseverfahren für einen Diskettenantrieb | [1984/42] | English: | Disk drive alignment analyzer | [1984/42] | French: | Analyseur d'alignement pour une unité à disques | [1984/42] | File destroyed: | 02.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 30.08.1983 | Examination requested [1984/42] | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0035915 (OLIVETTI TECNOST [IT]); | [A]US4084201 (HACK JOACHIM, et al); | [A]DE3117911 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4321636 (LENZ CHARLES E); | [A]US3593331 (CONNELL KENNETH P, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 1, June 1972, page 144, New York, US; R.A.JONES et al.: "Subsystem verification of seek addresses" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, vol. MAG-18, no. 6, November 1982, pages 1230-1232, New York, US; N.D.MACKINTOSH et al.: "A standard disk for calibrating head-disk interference measuring equipment" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 20, no. 5, October 1977, pages 1893-1896, New York, US; T.M.PASKA: "Multitracks per inch actuator/accessing arrangement" |