EP0103283 - An apparatus for inserting a tool into the ground and continuously rotating it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.L.S.E. EDILIZIA LAVORI SOTTOSUOLO ESTRAZIONI S.p.A. Via Giuseppe Sacchi, 7 I-20121 Milan / IT | [1984/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vandoni, Carlo Viale Tunisia 13 I-20124 Milano / IT | [1988/27] |
Former [1984/12] | 01 /
Vandoni, Carlo of Viale Tunisia 13 I-20124 Milan / IT | Representative(s) | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/12] | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 I-20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 83108909.9 | 09.09.1983 | [1984/12] | Priority number, date | IT19820023221 | 13.09.1982 Original published format: IT 2322182 | [1984/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0103283 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0103283 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103283 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/20, E02D7/26, E02D7/22 | [1984/12] | CPC: |
E21B3/02 (EP,US);
E02D7/22 (EP);
E02D7/26 (EP);
E21B7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Vortreiben eines Werkzeuges in den Boden unter kontinuierlicher Drehbewegung | [1984/12] | English: | An apparatus for inserting a tool into the ground and continuously rotating it | [1984/12] | French: | Appareil pour l'enfoncement dans le sol d'un outil en rotation continue | [1984/12] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/31] | 12.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.03.1985 | M02   Fee paid on   02.05.1985 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.11.1985 | 01.10.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.10.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.1988 | CH | 06.07.1988 | FR | 06.07.1988 | LI | 06.07.1988 | NL | 06.07.1988 | GB | 09.09.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/33] | AT | 06.07.1988 | |
CH | 06.07.1988 | ||
LI | 06.07.1988 | ||
NL | 06.07.1988 | ||
GB | 09.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/27] | AT | 06.07.1988 | |
CH | 06.07.1988 | ||
LI | 06.07.1988 | ||
NL | 06.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 06.07.1988 | |
NL | 06.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | NL | 06.07.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1083891 (BADE & CO GMBH); | [Y]GB1094201 (CEMENTATION CO LTD); | [A]FR1524223 (PRESSPALI SPA); | [A]US3666026 (ALLARD PIERRE JEAN-MARIE THEOD); | [YD]US3763654 (MATSUSHITA K); | [A]DE2438956 (LEFFER STAHL & APP); | [XP]GB2114185 (MATSUZAWA KIKO KK, et al) |