EP0107772 - Method of measuring the electric potential on a buried solid-state substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.1988 [1988/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schink, Helmut, Dipl.-Phys. Knappertsbuschstrasse 5 D-8000 München 81 / DE | [1984/19] | Application number, filing date | 83109005.5 | 12.09.1983 | [1984/19] | Priority number, date | DE19823235100 | 22.09.1982 Original published format: DE 3235100 | [1984/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107772 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107772 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/26 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
G01R31/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1984/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung elektrischer Potentiale an vergrabener Festkörpersubstanz | [1984/19] | English: | Method of measuring the electric potential on a buried solid-state substance | [1984/19] | French: | Procédé pour mesurer le potentiel électrique à un composant monolithique coude enterré | [1984/19] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 18.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0005762 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [Y] - SOLID-STATE ELECTRONICS, Band 22, Nr. 8, 1979 R. HEZEL "Electron-beam-induced-current investigations on MOS and MNOS devices", Seiten 735-742 |