EP0107034 - Flying spot scanner for light-microscopic studies in a scanning electron microscope, and operating process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feuerbaum, Hans-Peter, Dr., Dipl.-Phys. Arno-Assmann-Strasse 14 D-8000 München 83 / DE | [1984/18] | Application number, filing date | 83109279.6 | 19.09.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | DE19823235449 | 24.09.1982 Original published format: DE 3235449 | [1984/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0107034 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0107034 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/28, H01J37/22 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
H01J37/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1984/18] | Title | German: | Flying-Spot Scanner für lichtmikroskopische Untersuchungen in einem Raster-Elektronenmikroskop und Verfahren zu seinem Betrieb | [1984/18] | English: | Flying spot scanner for light-microscopic studies in a scanning electron microscope, and operating process | [1984/18] | French: | Flying-spot scanner pour examens d'échantillons par microscopie optique dans un microscope électronique à balayage et procédé pour son utilisation | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 29.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/25] | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3403387 ; | [A]EP0050475 | [X] - SOVIET JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, Band 9, Nr. 7, Juli 1979, Seiten 891-893, New York, US; S.A. BELYAEV et al.: "Scanning optical microscope based on an electron-beam-pumped semiconductor laser" | [Y] - MEASUREMENT TECHNIQUES, Band 12, Nr. 12, Dezember 1978, Seiten 1662-1665, New York, US; O.V. BOGDANKEVICH et al.: "Scanning optical microscope" |