EP0103892 - Optical recording medium and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES 3300 Hyland Avenue Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/13] | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES 3300 Hyland Avenue Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilkinson, Richard L. 21341 Avenida Manantial El Toro California 92630 / US | 02 /
Slaten, Gary G. 11761 Speedway Tucson Arizona 85710 / US | [1984/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/12] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/13] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Fleuchaus & Wehser Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109365.3 | 20.09.1983 | [1984/13] | Priority number, date | US19820419871 | 20.09.1982 Original published format: US 419871 | [1984/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0103892 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0103892 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103892 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26 | [1984/13] | CPC: |
G11B7/00451 (EP);
G11B7/242 (KR);
G11B7/244 (EP);
G11B7/26 (EP,KR);
G11B7/245 (EP);
G11B7/2542 (EP);
G11B7/258 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/13] | Title | German: | Optischer Aufzeichnungsträger und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1984/13] | English: | Optical recording medium and method of making same | [1984/13] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique et procédé de fabrication d'un tel support | [1984/13] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 27.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 15.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.05.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP53124404 ; | [X]FR2368779 (THOMSON BRANDT [FR]); | [X]GB2005457 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]EP0022313 (DISCOVISION ASS [US]); | [A]EP0051283 (DISCOVISION ASS [US]); | [A]DE3203599 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [AP]EP0072378 (DISCOVISION ASS [US]) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 154, 25 December 1978; & JP-A-53 124 404 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 30-10-1978, & JP53124404 A 19781225 |