EP0104632 - 1'-(3-(1,2-Benzisoxazol-3-yl)propyl)spiro-(benzofuran-2-(3H),3' or 4'-piperidine or 3'-pyrrolidines), a process for their preparation and their use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Route 202-206 North Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Larry P.O. Box 129 Sergeantsville, N.J. 08557 / US | 02 /
Pierrat, Frank A. 90 Jefferson Street Somerset, N.J. 08873 / US | [1984/14] | Representative(s) | Klein, Otto, et al Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, SU Patente 84504 Burgkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Klein, Otto, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, Patentbüro D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE | ||
Former [1984/14] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr. Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109520.3 | 24.09.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | US19820424379 | 29.09.1982 Original published format: US 424379 | [1984/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0104632 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0104632 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104632 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/10, A61K31/435, A61K31/55, A61K31/42, C07D261/20, // (C07D491/10, 307:00, 221:00) | [1984/14] | CPC: |
C07D491/10 (EP,US);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D211/42 (EP,US);
C07D211/48 (EP,US);
C07D261/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/14] | Title | German: | 1'-(3-(1,2-Benzisoxazol-3-yl)propyl)spiro-(benzofuran-2-(3H),3'- oder 4'-Piperidine oder 3'-Pyrrolidine), Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Anwendung als Arzneimittel | [1984/14] | English: | 1'-(3-(1,2-Benzisoxazol-3-yl)propyl)spiro-(benzofuran-2-(3H),3' or 4'-piperidine or 3'-pyrrolidines), a process for their preparation and their use as medicaments | [1984/14] | French: | 1'-(3-(1,2-Benzisoxazol-3-yl)propyl)spiro-(benzofuran-2-(3H),3'- ou 4'-pipéridines ou 3'-pyrrolidines), procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme médicaments | [1984/14] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP51136666 [ ]; | EP0004952 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, 1977, page 519, abstract 87:39459c Columbus, Ohio, US & JP-A 51 136 666 (DAINIPPON) (26-11-1976) * Abstract *, & JP51136666 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0149229 | EP0063799 |