EP0107797 - An input circuit for converting an a.c. input voltage to a logic level voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allen-Bradley Company 1201 South Second Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states Allen-Bradley Company 1201 South Second Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Callan, John E. 2911 North Summit Avenue Milwaukee Wisconsin 53211 / US | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Lippert, Hans, et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | Lippert, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109667.2 | 28.09.1983 | [1984/19] | Priority number, date | US19820427568 | 29.09.1982 Original published format: US 427568 | [1984/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107797 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/165 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
H03K5/08 (EP,US);
G01R19/16576 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/19] | Title | German: | Eingangskreis zum Umsetzen einer Wechseleingangsspannung in eine logische Spannung | [1984/19] | English: | An input circuit for converting an a.c. input voltage to a logic level voltage | [1984/19] | French: | Circuit d'entrée pour convertir une tension alternative dans un niveau de tension logique | [1984/19] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/31] | 04.02.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 31, no. 7, April 1982, pages 57-61, M}nchenDE. | [ ] - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 31, no. 7, April 1982, pages 57-61, M}nchenDE. |