EP0106253 - Numerical control machine tool with an emergency origin returning function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.1990 [1990/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inagaki, Syoji 5-59, Takatsunami-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Sanpe, Hideyuki 13-72, Osada Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Makihara, Norimitsu 17, Higashikurakade Katahara-cho Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109862.9 | 03.10.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | JP19820179218 | 13.10.1982 Original published format: JP 17921882 | [1984/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0106253 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0106253 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106253 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/18, G05B19/23 | [1984/17] | CPC: |
G05B19/232 (EP,US);
G05B19/4067 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34365 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50024 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50103 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50198 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50249 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/17] | Title | German: | Numerisch gesteuerte Werkzeugmaschine mit einer Funktion die im Notfall zur Ausgangsstellung zurückführt | [1984/17] | English: | Numerical control machine tool with an emergency origin returning function | [1984/17] | French: | Machine-outil à commande numérique ayant une fonction permettant un retour à la position initiale en cas d'urgence | [1984/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 13.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.04.1989 | [1990/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3496805 (ULRICHSEN BORRE, et al); | [A]US3701113 (CHACE DONALD E, et al); | [Y]EP0023824 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0027317 (FANUC LTD [JP]) |