EP0112981 - Roll changing device for six-roll rolling stands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [1984/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Römmen, Hans Erlenweg 7 D-4047 Dormagen 11 / DE | 02 /
Frosch, Hans Furtherhofstrasse 70 D-4040 Neuss / DE | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner, et al Hammerstrasse 2 D-5900 Siegen 1 / DE | [1987/26] |
Former [1984/28] | Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 55 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 83109930.4 | 05.10.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | DE19823244200 | 30.11.1982 Original published format: DE 3244200 | [1984/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112981 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112981 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112981 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B21B31/08 | [1984/28] | CPC: |
B21B31/103 (EP,US);
B21B2013/028 (EP,US);
B21B27/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/28] | Title | German: | Walzenwechselvorrichtung für Sechswalzen-Walzgerüste | [1984/28] | English: | Roll changing device for six-roll rolling stands | [1984/28] | French: | Dispositif de changement de cylindres pour cages de laminoir à 6 cylindres | [1984/28] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1941186 (MESTA MACHINE CO); | [A]GB2019761 (DAVY LOEWY LTD); | [A]DE3123933 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |