EP0107179 - Device for splitting a gas mixture by selective adsorption of a fraction of the mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preussag AG Kunststoffe u. Armaturen D-3150 Peine / DE | [1984/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hübener, Mark Am Spick 5 D-4005 Meerbusch 3 / DE | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/31] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/18] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110444.3 | 19.10.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | DE19823238969 | 21.10.1982 Original published format: DE 3238969 | [1984/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0107179 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0107179 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01J19/04 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
B01D53/0423 (EP);
B01D53/047 (EP);
F16K11/074 (EP);
B01D2253/106 (EP);
B01D2253/108 (EP);
B01D2256/12 (EP);
B01D2257/102 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
B01D2259/40005 (EP);
B01D2259/4003 (EP);
B01D2259/40037 (EP);
B01D2259/40041 (EP);
B01D2259/40064 (EP);
B01D2259/40069 (EP);
B01D2259/404 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zerlegen eines Gasgemisches durch selektive Adsorption einer Gemischfraktion | [1984/18] | English: | Device for splitting a gas mixture by selective adsorption of a fraction of the mixture | [1984/18] | French: | Dispositif pour diviser un mélange de gaz par adsorption sélective d'une fraction du mélange | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/13] | 23.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.07.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2033777 ; | [AD]DE1544036 ; | [A]FR1582757 |