EP0111679 - Garden bench with two legs supporting a seat and a backrest [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Münkel GmbH & Co. KG. Henkenstrasse 59-67 D-4837 Verl 1 / DE | [1984/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Münkel, Karl Henkenstrasse 27 D-4837 Verl 1 / DE | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110516.8 | 21.10.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | DE19820032782U | 23.11.1982 Original published format: DE 8232782 U | [1984/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0111679 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0111679 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111679 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A47C11/00 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
A47C4/03 (EP);
A47C11/00 (EP);
A47C4/02 (EP);
A47C5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1984/26] | Title | German: | Gartenbank mit zwei das Sitzteil und die Rückenlehne tragenden Bankfüssen | [1984/26] | English: | Garden bench with two legs supporting a seat and a backrest | [1984/26] | French: | Banc de jardin avec deux pieds portant le siège et le dossier | [1984/26] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/47] | 12.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1851728U (STAUSBERG HANS [DE], et al); | [A]FR1464162 ; | [Y]GB1389265 (CORBETTA L); | [A]GB1512860 (STAINES METAL PROD) |