|
20.05.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1996 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.1996 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.1996 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1996 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1996 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.1996 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.1996 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.1995 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1995 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.09.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.1993 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.02.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1993 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1991 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.07.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.03.1990 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.1989 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.09.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
27.09.1989 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1989 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.1989 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
06.06.1989 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
18.08.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1988 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.1987 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1987 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.1986 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1986 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1984 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
25.10.1983 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1983 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.10.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
21.10.1983 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.10.1983 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |