EP0111124 - Polyene compounds, their preparation and pharmaceutical preparations containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1987 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pawson, Beverley Ann 7 Belleclaire Place Verona, N.J. / US | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110606.7 | 24.10.1983 | [1984/25] | Priority number, date | US19820439516 | 05.11.1982 Original published format: US 439516 | [1984/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111124 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111124 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/64, C07C69/734, C07C103/58, C07C154/00, C07C43/225, C07F9/52, C07C47/277 | [1984/25] | CPC: |
C07C329/00 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C43/225 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07C45/298 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/298, C07C47/277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/25] | Title | German: | Polyenverbindungen, ihre Herstellung und diese Verbindungen enthaltende pharmazeutische Präparate | [1984/25] | English: | Polyene compounds, their preparation and pharmaceutical preparations containing them | [1984/25] | French: | Dérivés polyéniques, leur préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1984/25] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/25] | 06.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4054589 (BOLLAG WERNER, et al); | [A]US4266073 (CHAN KA-KONG, et al) |