EP0111130 - Multi-terminal data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, Keith F., Jr. 4034 Hockaday Dallas Texas 75229 / US | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Bonin, Jean-Jacques Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Bonin, Jean-Jacques Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 83110684.4 | 26.10.1983 | [1984/25] | Priority number, date | US19820446725 | 03.12.1982 Original published format: US 446725 | [1984/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0111130 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0111130 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111130 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/153 | [1984/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/0489 (EP);
G06F3/153 (EP);
G09G2360/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/25] | Title | German: | Vielfachterminal-Datenverarbeitungsanlage | [1984/25] | English: | Multi-terminal data processing system | [1984/25] | French: | Ordinateur à plusieurs terminaux | [1984/25] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 17.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1449142 (GROOVE CONSULTING CO LTD GROVE, et al); | [A]GB2052210 (DATA GENERAL CORP) | [Y] - COMPUTERS & GRAPHICS, vol. 3, no. 4, 1978, pages 129-134, Pergamon Press Ltd., (GB); | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 6, November 1980, pages 2464/5, New York (USA); | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 5, October 1976, page 1916, New York (USA); | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 10, March 1980, pages 4586-4590, New York (USA); |