EP0112463 - Apparatus for detecting the position of moving member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Tadashi 1415-7, Ishinazakacho Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Miyashita, Kunio 45-15, Nishinarusawacho-4-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 03 /
Kawamata, Syooichi 36-3, Nishinarusawacho-1-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 04 /
Morinaga, Shigeki 17-2-403, Moriyamacho-3-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Strehl, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening u. Partner Postfach 22 14 55 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110829.5 | 28.10.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | JP19820189265 | 29.10.1982 Original published format: JP 18926582 | [1984/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112463 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112463 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112463 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/16 | [1984/27] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1984/27] | Title | German: | Positionsdetektor für ein sich bewegendes Teil | [1992/07] | English: | Apparatus for detecting the position of moving member | [1984/27] | French: | Dispositif pour détecter la position d'un organe en mouvement | [1984/27] |
Former [1984/27] | Positionsdetektor für ein Teil in Bewegung | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 10.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 12.02.1992 | LI | 12.02.1992 | SE | 12.02.1992 | GB | 28.10.1992 | [1993/48] |
Former [1992/38] | CH | 12.02.1992 | |
LI | 12.02.1992 | ||
SE | 12.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 12.02.1992 | |
LI | 12.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0048983 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0080639 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2251917 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [AD]FR2418442 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US4024458 (TEMPLIN JACKSON R) |