EP0108363 - Train service administration and control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/20] | Method and apparatus for administration and control of train service | ||
[1991/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miki, Hiromu 4-8, Takaoka-1-chome Ohkubocho, Akashi-shi / JP | 02 /
Tomizawa, Yukio 425-22, Wada, Inamicho Kako-gun, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Strehl, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening u. Partner Postfach 22 14 55 D-80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/20] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-Ing. P. Strehl Dr. U. Schübel-Hopf Dr. R. Schulz Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 17 Postfach 22 03 45 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110839.4 | 28.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | JP19820193231 | 02.11.1982 Original published format: JP 19323182 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108363 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108363 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108363 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B61L27/00 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
B61L25/00 (EP);
B61L21/00 (EP);
B61L27/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/20] | Title | German: | System zur Verwaltung und Steuerung des Zugverkehrs | [1991/24] | English: | Train service administration and control system | [1991/24] | French: | Système pour la gestion et la commande du service ferroviaire | [1991/24] |
Former [1984/20] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung und Steuerung des Eisenbahndienstes | ||
Former [1984/20] | Method and apparatus for administration and control of train service | ||
Former [1984/20] | Procédé et dispositif pour la gestion et la commande du service ferroviaire | Examination procedure | 25.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP52049511 ; | [A]JP53013705 ; | [A]JP52077311 ; | [A]JP55062368 ; | [A]US4015804 (DOBLER KARL ULRICH, et al); | [A]US4023753 (DOBLER KARL U) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 113, 29th September 1977, page 3427 M 77; & JP-A-52 049 511 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 20-04-1977, & JP52049511 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 54, 19th April 1978, page 581 M 78; & JP-A-53 013 705 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 07-02-1978, & JP53013705 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 137, 11th November 1977, page 4719 M 77; & JP-A-52 077 311 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 29-06-1977, & JP52077311 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 103 (P-20)[585], 23rd July 1980; & JP-A-55 062 368 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 10-05-1980, & JP55062368 A 00000000 |