EP0110170 - Honey powder in which the natural flavours are preserved, and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1988 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.1988 [1988/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT. To utca 1-5 H-1045 Budapest IV / HU | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT. To utca 1-5 H-1045 Budapest IV / HU | ||
Former [1984/29] | For all designated states CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT To utca 1-5 H-1045 Budapest IV / HU | ||
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT. To utca 1-5 H-1045 Budapest IV / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szejtli, József, Dr. Endrödi S. u. 38/40 H-1026 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Tardy geb. Lengyel, Márta, Dr. Csalán u. 43/b H-1025 Budapest / HU | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Lotterhos, Hans Walter Lichtensteinstrasse 3 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Lotterhos, Hans Walter, Dr.-Ing. Lichtensteinstrasse 3 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110862.6 | 29.10.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | HU19820003577 | 08.11.1982 Original published format: HU 357782 | [1984/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110170 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110170 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/08 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
A23L27/77 (EP,US);
A23L21/25 (EP,US);
A23L27/70 (EP,US);
A23P10/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/24] | Title | German: | Honigpulver, in dem die natürlichen Aromastoffe erhalten bleiben, und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1984/24] | English: | Honey powder in which the natural flavours are preserved, and process for its production | [1984/24] | French: | Poudre de miel dans lequel les arômes naturels restent conservés et son procédé de production | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 05.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3061444 (ROGERS WILLIAM I, et al); | [AD]US3879567 (VERNER REESE D); | [A]US3950551 (GLABE ELMER F, et al) | Examination | US2693420 | - "Sugar Chemistry" R.S. Schallenberger et al. Avi Publishing Company USA 1975 pp. 158-159 |