EP0110171 - Vehicle positions locating arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELDIX GmbH Postfach 10 56 08 D-69046 Heidelberg / DE | [1984/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Paul, Dr. rer.nat. Am Büchsenackerhang 35 D-6900 Heidelberg 1 / DE | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Kammer, Arno Goethestrasse 2 68766 Hockenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Kammer, Arno, Dipl.-Ing. Goethestrasse 2 D-68766 Hockenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110863.4 | 29.10.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | DE19823242904 | 20.11.1982 Original published format: DE 3242904 | [1984/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110171 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110171 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110171 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/14, G08G1/123 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
G01C21/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/24] | G01C21/14, G08G1/12 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Ermittlung des Standorts eines Fahrzeugs | [1984/24] | English: | Vehicle positions locating arrangement | [1984/24] | French: | Dispositif de repérage de la position d'un véhicule | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   09.12.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2910386 ; | [A]EP0036119 ; | [A]FR2470362 ; | [Y]DE2341162 |