EP0108396 - Stabilized graft copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BORG-WARNER CHEMICALS INC. International Center Parkersburg West Virginia 26101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER CHEMICALS INC. International Center Parkersburg West Virginia 26101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wozny, John C. P.O. Box 112 Coolville Ohio 45723 / US | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83110979.8 | 03.11.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | US19820439164 | 04.11.1982 Original published format: US 439164 | US19820439515 | 05.11.1982 Original published format: US 439515 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108396 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108396 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08L21/02, C08K5/37, C08C19/20, C08F279/00 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
C08K5/37 (EP);
C08K5/372 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/372, C08L21/02 (EP);
C08K5/37, C08L21/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/20] | Title | German: | Stabilisierte Pfropfcopolymere | [1984/20] | English: | Stabilized graft copolymers | [1984/20] | French: | Copolymères greffés stabilisés | [1984/20] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/40] | 10.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3168593 (FREMON GEORGE H, et al); | [A]BE656258 ; | [A]GB1575115 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 54, no. 20, 25th October 1960, column 21821i, Columbus, Ohio, USA |