EP0131651 - Process and installation for making very high alloy deformed steels and special alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.1988 [1988/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sindelar, Günter, Dr.-Ing. Paulinenstrasse 63 D-5102 Würselen / DE | For all designated states Fahrensteiner, Julius, Ing. Dkfm. Gassmannstrasse 1-19/7 A-1120 Wien / AT | [1986/46] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states Sindelar, Günter, Dr.-Ing. Paulinenstrasse 63 D-5102 Würselen / DE | ||
For all designated states Andritz Ruthner Industrieanlagen Aktiengesellschaft Aichholzgasse 51-53 A-1121 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/46] |
Former [1985/04] | 01 /
Sindelar, Günter, Dr.-Ing. Paulinenstrasse 63 D-5102 Würselen / DE | ||
02 /
Fahrensteiner, Julius, Dipl.-Kfm. Aichholzgasse 51-53 A-1121 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, et al Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Patentanwälte, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 D-51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111011.9 | 04.11.1983 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | DE19833320856 | 09.06.1983 Original published format: DE 3320856 | [1985/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131651 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/00 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
C21D8/005 (EP);
C21D9/0081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Herstellung von höchstlegierten verformten Stählen und Sonderlegierungen | [1985/04] | English: | Process and installation for making very high alloy deformed steels and special alloys | [1985/04] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la fabrication d'aciers hautement alliés déformés et alliages spéciaux | [1985/04] | File destroyed: | 02.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 19.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 11.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/10] | 15.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.06.1986 | 30.11.1987 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2700574 ; | [A]DE353299 ; | [A]DE1005994 ; | [A]US3257835 | [Y] - LEITNER-PLÖCKINGER "Die Edelstahlerzeugung", 2. Auflage, 1965, SPRINGER-VERLAG, Wien, New York, Seiten 796-798 | [A] - STAHL UND EISEN, Band 94, Nr. 18, 29.8.1974, Düsseldorf; H. HOJAS et al. "Planung und Betrieb einer neuen Edelstahlschmiede", Seiten 841-849 |