EP0108404 - Process and equipment for determining or influencing the flow properties of solid granular materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1988 [1988/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZETI GYAR R.T. Gyömröi ut 19-21 1475 Budapest / HU | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZETI GYAR R.T. Gyömröi ut 19-21 H-1475 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dávid, Agoston, Dr. 12, Batthyány u H-1015 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Pogány, János 140, Sasadi u H-1112 Budapest / HU | 03 /
Rönkös, László 47, Bodnár u H-1163 Budapest / HU | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111033.3 | 04.11.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | HU19820003545 | 04.11.1982 Original published format: HU 354582 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108404 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108404 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/04 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
G01N11/06 (EP,US);
G01N33/0091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bestimmen oder Beeinflussen des Fliessverhaltens körniger fester Stoffe | [1984/20] | English: | Process and equipment for determining or influencing the flow properties of solid granular materials | [1984/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif permettant de mesurer ou d'influencer les propriétés d'écoulement de matériaux solides granulaires | [1984/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/41] | 06.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1165313 (LEWIS HOWE COMPANY [US]); | [A]DE2658089 (CHINOIN GYOGYSZER ES VEGYESZET); | [A]US4320657 (JOHNSON III JOSEPH L) |