EP0112999 - Foamed concrete block and method of producing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.1987 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ackermann, Manfred F., Dipl.-Ing. Heidestrasse 49 D-44866 Bochum / DE | [1984/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erdmann, Wilfried, Dr.-Ing. Selbsthilfeweg 3 D-4630 Bochum / DE | 02 /
Köhling, Rolf, Dr. Lohbusch 1 D-4630 Bochum-Wattenscheid / DE | 03 /
Leininger, Dieter, Dr. Waldeck 16 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Schulte, Jörg Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | Schulte, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 2 D-45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111058.0 | 05.11.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | DE19823244765 | 03.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3244765 | [1984/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0112999 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112999 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C04B18/08, C04B18/12, C04B20/04, // C04B22/00 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
C04B18/061 (EP);
C04B18/12 (EP);
C04B28/10 (EP);
C04B38/02 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/10, C04B7/02, C04B14/06, C04B18/08, C04B18/10, C04B18/12, C04B22/04, C04B38/02, C04B40/02 (EP);
C04B28/10, C04B7/02, C04B14/06, C04B18/08, C04B18/12, C04B18/125, C04B22/04, C04B38/02, C04B40/02 (EP);
C04B38/02, C04B28/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/28] | C04B31/02, C04B31/10, C04B31/40, // C04B21/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/28] | Title | German: | Schaumbetonstein und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1984/28] | English: | Foamed concrete block and method of producing it | [1984/28] | French: | Bloc de béton écumeux et procédé de fabrication | [1984/28] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 03.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1152934 ; | [A]DD42866 ; | [A]DE2406373 (NEUMANN VENEVERE PETER DR ING) | [A] - Chemical Abstracts Band 97, Nr. 18, 1. November 1982, Columbus, Ohio, USA J.G. ROSE et al. "Processing and material properties of energy-efficient sintered coal refuse lightweight aggregate", Seite 317, Spalte 2, Abstract Nr. 149649d | Examination | EP0059444 |