EP0111716 - Turnable bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kessel, Bernhard Bahnhofstrasse 31 D-85101 Lenting / DE | [1984/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Sasse, Volker Parreutstrasse 27 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | Sasse, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Parreutstrasse 27 D-85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111063.0 | 05.11.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | DE19823242451 | 16.11.1982 Original published format: DE 3242451 | [1984/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0111716 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0111716 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111716 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E03F7/04, F16K15/03 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
E03F7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1984/26] | Title | German: | Schwenklagerung | [1984/26] | English: | Turnable bearing | [1984/26] | French: | Support pivotable | [1984/26] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 05.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.01.1988 | FR | 13.01.1988 | IT | 13.01.1988 | NL | 13.01.1988 | SE | 31.01.1988 | [2007/44] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 13.01.1988 | |
FR | 13.01.1988 | ||
IT | 13.01.1988 | ||
NL | 13.01.1988 | ||
SE | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 13.01.1988 | |
IT | 13.01.1988 | ||
NL | 13.01.1988 | ||
SE | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/21] | BE | 13.01.1988 | |
NL | 13.01.1988 | ||
SE | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/10] | BE | 13.01.1988 | |
NL | 13.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 13.01.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB604940 (JOSEPH HIRSHSTEIN); | [A]EP0047482 (DALLMER HELMUTH FA [DE]) |