EP0109033 - Purification of bisphenol-A [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mendiratta, Ashok Kumar 1317 Viewmont Drive Schenectady New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Morgan, Wayne Francis RD No.2, Box 355 C. Waterford Road Mechanicville New York 12118 / US | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111127.3 | 08.11.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | US19820443344 | 15.11.1982 Original published format: US 443344 | [1984/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109033 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109033 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/84, C07C39/16 | [1984/21] | CPC: |
C07C37/84 (EP,US);
C07C37/685 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/685, C07C39/16 (US,EP);
C07C37/84, C07C39/16 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1984/21] | Title | German: | Reinigung von Bisphenol-A | [1984/21] | English: | Purification of bisphenol-A | [1984/21] | French: | Purification de bisphénol A | [1984/21] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 03.06.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/49] | 03.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.05.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3326986 (DUGAN GORDON F, et al); | [A]US4354046 (LADEWIG GLEN R, et al); | [A]US4079087 (SUN YUN CHUNG); | [A]US4294993 (LI MING K) |