EP0109041 - Method and device for binding books [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1989 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EWO Produktionssysteme GmbH Hackethalstrasse 2 Postfach 6547 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | [1988/02] |
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states Dipl.-Ing. Hans Ehlermann GmbH & Co. KG Weserstrasse 26 Postfach 1209 D-2810 Verden/Aller / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehlermann, Hans-Dieter Hinter dem Paschberg 8 D-2810 Verden-Scharnhorst / DE | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Utermann, Gerd Kilianstrasse 7 (Kilianspassage) 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Utermann, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing. Kilianstrasse 7 (Kilianspassage) D-74072 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111163.8 | 09.11.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | DE19823241477 | 10.11.1982 Original published format: DE 3241477 | [1984/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0109041 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109041 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B42C9/02 | [1984/21] | CPC: |
B42C11/04 (EP,US);
B42C9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/41] |
Former [1984/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einbinden eines Buches | [1984/21] | English: | Method and device for binding books | [1984/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de reliure de livres | [1984/21] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 12.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.10.1988 | FR | 12.10.1988 | NL | 12.10.1988 | SE | 12.10.1988 | AT | 09.11.1988 | LU | 30.11.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 12.10.1988 | |
NL | 12.10.1988 | ||
SE | 12.10.1988 | ||
AT | 09.11.1988 | ||
LU | 30.11.1988 | ||
Former [1990/19] | BE | 12.10.1988 | |
NL | 12.10.1988 | ||
SE | 12.10.1988 | ||
AT | 09.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/41] | BE | 12.10.1988 | |
NL | 12.10.1988 | ||
SE | 12.10.1988 | ||
Former [1989/35] | BE | 12.10.1988 | |
SE | 12.10.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 12.10.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1096866 (LEIPZIGER BUCHBINDEREIMASCHINE); | [Y]DE7500838U ; | [A]DE2725139 (EHLERMANN HANS DIPL ING); | [Y]GB1558386 (MAYCOCK P); | [X]WO8103644 (KUSTANNUS OY OTAVA [FI], et al) |