EP0110273 - Method of and apparatus for dispensing a liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexcel International, Inc. 12596 W. Bayaud Street Suite 290 Lakewood, Colorado 80228 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states Flexcel International, Inc. 12596 W. Bayaud Street Suite 290 Lakewood, Colorado 80228 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curiel, Yoram 1956 S. Nome Aurora Colorado 80014 / US | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83111593.6 | 21.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | US19820445458 | 30.11.1982 Original published format: US 445458 | US19830480934 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: US 480934 | [1984/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110273 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110273 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110273 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/06 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
B60K15/06 (EP);
B67D7/04 (KR);
B65B3/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Austeilung einer Flüssigkeit | [1984/24] | English: | Method of and apparatus for dispensing a liquid | [1984/24] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour transférer un liquide | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 11.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB794125 (FIREPROOF TANKS LTD); | [A]DE2715142 (PORSCHE AG) |