EP0110348 - Lamp framework and its suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.1988 [1988/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüggemann, Jürgen Berliner Strasse 31 D-8225 Traunreut / DE | 02 /
Kranz, Hans-Werner Steigerstrasse 11 D-8651 Kupferberg / DE | 03 /
Kühmstedt, Wulf Waldseestrasse 14 D-8521 Langensendelbach / DE | [1984/24] | Application number, filing date | 83111833.6 | 25.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | DE19823243883 | 26.11.1982 Original published format: DE 3243883 | DE19833332015 | 05.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3332015 | [1984/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110348 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110348 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/00, F21S3/14 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
F21S2/00 (EP,US);
F21V21/00 (EP);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Leuchtenrahmen und dessen Halterung | [1984/24] | English: | Lamp framework and its suspension | [1984/24] | French: | Armature de lampe et sa fixation | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU490813 ; | [X]DE2140202 (SCHILLING JOCHEN); | [X]FR2303233 (KINKELDEY LEUCHTEN [DE]); | [A]DE2645767 (FISCHER METALLWARENFAB KARL) | Examination | DE3041111 |